United States of America v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kevin L. Wilson and Tonya R. Wilson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00202
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kevin L. Wilson served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Humphries, William)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Tonya R. Wilson waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Humphries, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kevin L. Wilson and Tonya R. Wilson. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Tonya Wilson Summons)(jd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin L. Wilson, Tonya R. Wilson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Cover Sheet)(Humphries, William) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/5/2019 with PDF that can't be edited) (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William M Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?