Lujan v. State of Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Michael V Lujan
Defendant: IDOC, Twin Falls Co Jail, State of Idaho and CAPP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00205
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION for Review by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (jp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION FOR REHEARING by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (jp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLANT'S BRIEF re #5 Notice filed by Michael V Lujan. (jp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees (Prisoner)by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (jp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION and Affidavit in Support for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (jp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Michael V Lujan re #2 Complaint, entitled "Notice of Appeal, Rule 35" (jp)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION & Affidavit in Support for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (jp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael V Lujan. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons)(jp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees (Prisoner) by Plaintiff Michael V Lujan. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lujan v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls Co Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?