Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls v. Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls
Defendant: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. (McAllister, Bruce)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - the Court will conduct an initial scheduling conference by telephone on SEPTEMBER 10, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (MTN. TIME), to discuss the entry of a scheduling order to govern the case going forward. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before SEPTEMBER 3,2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #7 Answer to Complaint and #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/30/2019. (ckh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company.(McAllister, Bruce)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls. Guideone Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Linscott, April)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving dkt. #3 and dkt. #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Robert Scott Taylor and Nickolaus Nelson Gower for Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Robert Scott Taylor. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1907177.)April M Linscott appearing for Plaintiff Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Linscott, April)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nickolaus Nelson Gower. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1907168.)April M Linscott appearing for Plaintiff Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Linscott, April)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Breach of Contract Tortious Bad Faith against Guideone Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1901859.), filed by Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Linscott, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls v. Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce R McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bible Missionary Church, Inc. of Twin Falls
Represented By: April M Linscott
Represented By: Nickolaus Nelson Gower
Represented By: Robert Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?