Gaukel et al v. Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anna Sue Gaukel and Lawrence R. Gaukel
Defendant: Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00221
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Andersen, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Andersen, Steven)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Anna Sue Gaukel, Lawrence R. Gaukel, Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #2 Supplement, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/19/2019. (jd)
June 18, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 6/18/2019. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re: docket no. #1 by Defendant Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Summons, #4 Ada County Docket)(Andersen, Steven) Modified on 6/18/2019 to link to docket no. 1(jd).
June 18, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The exhibits are filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and labeled the document name. Also please include the state court docket sheet as part of your exhibits. The filing party shall re-submit the notice of removal and attachments as a "Supplement" located in ECF under "Other Documents".(jd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-18-23156.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1901888.), filed by Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andersen, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaukel et al v. Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sue Gaukel
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence R. Gaukel
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imprimis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Schwartzman
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Represented By: Haley Krug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?