Shockey et al v. Advantage Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Danielle Shockey and Joel Shockey
Defendant: Advantage Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00224
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: William B Shubb
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00224-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Advantage Financial Services, LLC, Danielle Shockey, Joel Shockey re #1 Complaint, #4 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/3/2019. (alw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall Jason I Hasson immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advantage Financial Services, LLC. (Fawcett, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Mayes Fawcett on behalf of Advantage Financial Services, LLC (Fawcett, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant by Advantage Financial Services, LLC.(Fawcett, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I. Hasson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1907919.)Jeffrey I Hasson appearing for Defendant Advantage Financial Services, LLC. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Hasson, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Advantage Financial Services, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1902559.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Ballard, Ryan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/1/2019 with PDF that can't be edited) (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shockey et al v. Advantage Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Shockey
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Shockey
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Mayes Fawcett
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?