Spreadburg v. Saint Alphonsus Behavioral Health
Plaintiff: Andrea Irene Leah Spreadburg and Andrea Irene Leah Spreadbury
Defendant: Saint Alphonsus Behavioral Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv00236
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Andrea Spreadbury (changed spelling of name on docket per letter)(alw)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for a civil case against Saint Alphonsus Behavioral Health, filed by Andrea Irene Leah Spreadburg. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Andrea Irene Leah Spreadburg. Responses due by 7/15/2019 (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spreadburg v. Saint Alphonsus Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Irene Leah Spreadburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Irene Leah Spreadbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Alphonsus Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?