Steed Construction, Inc v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steed Construction, Inc
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00238
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Auto-Owners ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Brady, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Steed Construction, Inc re #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/30/2019. (jp)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Brady on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Brady, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT - Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS - Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00238-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1905105.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons, #7 Cover Sheet)(Thomson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steed Construction, Inc v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steed Construction, Inc
Represented By: James S Thomson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael G Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?