Zarr v. Aramark Services Inc. Disability Plan, et al
Plaintiff: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, Gail Zarr and Aramark Services Inc Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gail Zarr. Aramark Services Inc Disability Plan served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Berger, Erik)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/3/2019 02:00 PM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/28/2019 10:30 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 10/21/2019. (at)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT on Service and Motion for Extension of Time on Scheduling Conference by Gail Zarr. (Berger, Erik)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gail Zarr. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Berger, Erik)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by Gail Zarr. (Berger, Erik)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gail Zarr. (Berger, Erik)
July 10, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #6 Litigation Order, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard.(jd)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per the Litigation Order (dkt 5), Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before August 27, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan.(jp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISREGARD THIS FILING. LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Filed in error. Modified on 7/10/2019 to add corrective entry notes (jd).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiff(s) must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on September 3, 2019, at 2:00 PM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before August 27, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aramark Services Inc Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Sedgwick Claims)(jd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Erik W. Berger for Gail Zarr Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add "DOCKET ENTRY" in docket text (km).
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Erik W Berger. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1905927.)Greg J Maeser appearing for Plaintiff Gail Zarr. Responses due by 7/18/2019 (Maeser, Greg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aramark Services Inc Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1905909.), filed by Gail Zarr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Maeser, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarr v. Aramark Services Inc. Disability Plan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Zarr
Represented By: Greg J Maeser
Represented By: Erik W Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Services Inc Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?