Perkins et al v. Strike Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J. P., Linda Perkins and Jeremiah Perkins
Defendant: Strike Industries, Inc., Stockpile Defense, LLC and Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2019cv00256
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be remanded to the District Court ofthe Third Judicial District of the State of Idaho, in and for the County of Canyon.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court (Dkt. #4 )is deemed MOOT. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (jd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Remand by Strike Industries, Inc.. (Morgan, Cody)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Strike Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Strike Industries, Inc..(Stubbs, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Matthew G Gunn appearing for Plaintiff Jeremiah Perkins. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Gunn, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Strike Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Docket. (Morgan, Cody)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for J. P., Jeremiah Perkins, Linda Perkins, and Strike Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/9/2019. (km)
July 9, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re: docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Strike Industries, Inc. The filing party shall file the state court docket sheet as a Supplement, located under Other Filings, Other Documents, and link the docket entry to docket no. 1. For future Notice of Removal filings, please provide a description for all attachments. Additionally, the cover sheet requires a date and signature. (km)
July 9, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (km)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Strike Industries, Inc. from Canyon County District Court, case number CV14-19-05848.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1909567.), filed by Strike Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued #2 Complaint filed in Canyon County #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Cody) Modified on 7/9/2019 to add description of attachments (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins et al v. Strike Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P.
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Perkins
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Perkins
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strike Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Cody Lynn Morgan
Represented By: Richard L Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockpile Defense, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?