Rogue v Corelogic Credco, LLC
Plaintiff: Corelogic Solutions, LLC and John Manuel Rogue
Defendant: Corelogic Credco, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Corelogic Credco, LLC and John Manuel Rogue re #3 Amended Complaint and #4 Answer to Amended Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (ckh)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corelogic Credco, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreLogic, Inc. for Corelogic Credco, LLC.. (Bond, Brook)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Corelogic Credco, LLC.(Bond, Brook)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corelogic Solutions, LLC, filed by John Manuel Rogue.(Smith, Barkley)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Corelogic Solutions, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corelogic Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1910069.), filed by John Manuel Rogue. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Barkley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogue v Corelogic Credco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corelogic Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Manuel Rogue
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Credco, LLC
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?