SBP LLLP et al v. Hoffman Construction Company of America
Plaintiff: JRS Properties III LP, SBP LLLP and J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Hoffman Construction Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alix Town re #13 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, AAA's rules that were in effect in 2008, #2 Exhibit Exh. B, AAA's rules that were in effect in 2010)(Maurer, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/23/2019.(Maurer, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mark Bowen in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss re #11 Response to Motion filed by J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc., JRS Properties III LP, SBP LLLP . (Meuleman, Joe)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc., JRS Properties III LP, SBP LLLP. Replies due by 8/22/2019.(Southers, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc., JRS Properties III LP, SBP LLLP. (Southers, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Cristina Reyes re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #2 Exhibit 1b-Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #3 Exhibit 2a- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #4 Exhibit 2b- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #5 Exhibit 2c- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #6 Exhibit 3a- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #7 Exhibit 3b- Contracts between Hoffman and SRP, LLP, JRS Properties III LP, and J.R. Simplot Foundation, #8 Exhibit 4- Construction Industry Arbitration Rules of the AAA, #9 Exhibit 5- Hoffman's initial demand for arbitration and mediation, #10 Exhibit 6- Hoffman's amended demand for arbitration and mediation)(Maurer, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Alix Town re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America . (Attachments: #1 Errata Email reeceived from Simplot's counsel)(Maurer, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America.(Maurer, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Michael A. Maurer appearing for Defendant Hoffman Construction Company of America. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Maurer, Michael)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/16/2019. (ckh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Hoffman Construction Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal, of Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Applicaiton to Stay Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Application to Stay Arbitration, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Maurer, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hoffman Construction Company of America. (Maurer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Hoffman Construction Company of America served on 7/11/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoffman Construction Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Hoffman Corporation for Hoffman Construction Company of America.. (Maurer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from ADA County, case number CV01-19-10818.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1911751.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Mediation and Arbitration Demand, #2 State Complaint and Application to Stay Arbitration, #3 Amended State Complaint and Application to Stay Arbitration)(Maurer, Michael) Modified on 7/17/2019 to identify attachments in docket text. (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBP LLLP et al v. Hoffman Construction Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRS Properties III LP
Represented By: Joe Meuleman
Represented By: Wayne V Meuleman
Represented By: Joseph F Southers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBP LLLP
Represented By: Joe Meuleman
Represented By: Wayne V Meuleman
Represented By: Joseph F Southers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Meuleman
Represented By: Wayne V Meuleman
Represented By: Joseph F Southers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman Construction Company of America
Represented By: Michael A. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?