Sather v. 5th District, Twin Falls the State of Idaho
Petitioner: Michael Patrick Sather
Respondent: 5th District, Twin Falls the State of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2019cv00274
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Michael Sather requesting docket sheet. (Mailed docket sheet to petitioner.)(kt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Michael Sather inquiring on how to proceed with filing on his case. (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Michael Sather inquiring if his filing fee was received. (a copy of the docket sheet showing that his fee was received was mailed to Mr. Sather on 08/01/2019)(jd)
July 22, 2019 RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt # 24619 (jd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Michael Patrick Sather and emailed to L'Lamont Anderson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/10/2019. (jd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (as to case no. CR42-15-11600) by Petitioner Michael Patrick Sather. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Patrick Sather. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibits, #3 Speedy Trial, #4 Affidavit, #5 Harris, #6 Cluff)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sather v. 5th District, Twin Falls the State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Patrick Sather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 5th District, Twin Falls the State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?