State of Idaho v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Idaho Attorney Gen Lawrence G Wasden and State of Idaho
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation and Cephalon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00286
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Service of electronic case transfer to N. District of Ohio (jp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Brandt Silver-Korn, Todd Logan, Rafey Balabanian re: 14 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance, 15 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance (Attachments: #1 Todd Logan, #2 Rafey Balabanian)(alw)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for N. District of Ohio MDL 2804 (CTO-106) (Attachments: #1 email reflecting MDL text entry-stay is lifted, #2 email of Text Only Entry transferring case)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER- CTO-106, MDL No. 2804. (ckh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Mallinckrodt LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Endo Health Solutions Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Idaho. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Zanzig, W)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Summons Issued and #1 Complaint. Documents served via FedEx and USPS. Receipts and change ($44.13) sent by FedEx to counsel at Edelson PC, 123 Townsend Street, Suite 100, San Francisco, California 94107 on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter Request for International Service) (km)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Eve Lynn-Rapp for State of Idaho Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Eve Lynn-Rapp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1920671.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Zanzig, W)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 and #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brandt Silver-Korn,Benjamin H. Richman,David Mindell,Todd Logan,Jay Edelson,Rafey S. Balabanian for State of Idaho Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Deanna N. Pihos,Robert S. Libman,Benjamin J. Blustein,David P. Baltmanis for State of Idaho Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brandt Silver-Korn. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919128.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin H. Richman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919126.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David Mindell. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919124.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Todd Logan. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919118.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jay Edelson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919112.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rafey S. Balabanian. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919104.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Deanna N. Pihos. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919082.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Robert S. Libman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919081.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin J. Blustein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919079.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David P. Baltmanis. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919072.)W Scott Zanzig appearing for Plaintiff State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Zanzig, W)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Endo Health Solutions Summons, #2 Endo Pharmaceuticals Summons, #3 Janssen Pharmaceutica Summons, #4 Janssen Pharmaceuticals Summons, #5 Johnson & Johnson Summons, #6 Mallinckrodt LLC Summons, #7 Mallinckrodt PLC Summons, #8 Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Summons) (km)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., filed by State of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Idaho v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Attorney Gen Lawrence G Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: W Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Benjamin J. Blustein
Represented By: Deanna N. Pihos
Represented By: Robert S. Libman
Represented By: Brandt Silver-Korn
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Jane E Hochberg
Represented By: Todd Logan
Represented By: David P. Baltmanis
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: David Mindell
Represented By: Eve Lynn-Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?