Eddington v. Tewalt
Petitioner: Ronald Scott Eddington
Respondent: John Tewalt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00291
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
July 29, 2019 RECEIPT: Writ of Habeas Corpus Fee Received $5.00, receipt #IDX24651 Paid in Full. (jld)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (Exhibit 1) by Petitioner Ronald Scott Eddington re #1 Brief in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus attached to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Note submitted with Exhibits, #5 Envelope) (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Petitioner. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/23/2019. (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ronald Scott Eddington. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddington v. Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Scott Eddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?