Roles v. Christensen et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Roles
Defendant: Rhonda Owens and Jay Christensen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Objection to Courts Denial of In Forma Pauperis Application and Finding of Three Strikes and No Physical Injury re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raymond Roles. Responses due by 10/11/2019. (ckh)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $400.00 or present facts showing that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. If Plaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to establish imminent danger, the Court may dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Jay Christensen, Rhonda Owens, filed by Raymond Roles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IDOC Grievance Form) (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Roles. (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raymond A Roles. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees (Prisoner), #2 Exhibit Order Re: Partial Payment of Court Fees (Prisoner)) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roles v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Roles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?