Ingram et al v. Mouser et al
Plaintiff: Felisha Ingram, Dustin Ingram, Z. I., D. I., L. I. and Seth Downham
Defendant: Katie Mouser, St. Lukes, Does 1-50, Jessica Johnson, Ada County Sheriff Dept, Amy Barton, State of Idaho, Idaho Department of Health, Does 1 through 50 Inclusive, Amy L. Barton, M.D., Ada County Sheriff's Department and St. Luke's Children's Hospital
Case Number: 1:2019cv00308
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Counsel shall comply with Local Rule 4.1. (lc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #4 , #5 , & #6 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Paul W Leehey, Donnie R Cox, & Steven C Vosseller for Plaintiffs.Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 ERRATA by Guardian Ad Litem Seth Downham, Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram Pro Hac Vice Application. (Henson, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA by Guardian Ad Litem Seth Downham, Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram Pro Hac Vice Application. (Henson, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA by Guardian Ad Litem Seth Downham, Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram Pro Hac Vice Application. (Henson, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Steven C. Vosseller. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1924953.)Ryan P Henson appearing for Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Henson, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Paul W. Leehey. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1924950.)Ryan P Henson appearing for Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Henson, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Donnie R. Cox. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1924935.)Ryan P Henson appearing for Plaintiffs D. I., L. I., Z. I., Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Henson, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem Ryan P Henson appearing for Plaintiffs Dustin Ingram, Felisha Ingram, Seth Downham. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Henson, Ryan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1924659.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Henson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram et al v. Mouser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felisha Ingram
Represented By: Ryan P. Henson
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Represented By: Donnie R Cox
Represented By: Paul W Leehey
Represented By: Steven C Vosseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Ingram
Represented By: Ryan P. Henson
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Represented By: Donnie R Cox
Represented By: Paul W Leehey
Represented By: Steven C Vosseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. I.
Represented By: Ryan P. Henson
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Represented By: Donnie R Cox
Represented By: Paul W Leehey
Represented By: Steven C Vosseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. I.
Represented By: Ryan P. Henson
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Represented By: Donnie R Cox
Represented By: Paul W Leehey
Represented By: Steven C Vosseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. I.
Represented By: Ryan P. Henson
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Represented By: Donnie R Cox
Represented By: Paul W Leehey
Represented By: Steven C Vosseller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Downham
Represented By: Ryan P Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Mouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Lukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Sheriff Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Barton, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Children's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?