Sosa-Solorio v. USA
Petitioner: Arcenio Sosa-Solorio
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00315
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER PETITION. The Court will extend the governments deadline to respond to the petition by 60 days. The new deadline to respond is November 16, 2019. Petitioner will have 14 days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Christopher Steven Atwood appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Atwood, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Arcenio Sosa-Solorio. Responses due by 9/27/2019 (alw)
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to written response to Petitioner's motion (jd)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - The United States shallfile a written response to the Petitioners motion within thirty (30) days from the date of this scheduling order. The Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Upon receipt of the briefing, the matter will be reviewed by to the Court. The Court will decide whether additional proceedings are necessary, and if so, the Court will notify the parties to request further briefing and/or set the matter for hearing. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 15, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00315-DCN on all future pleadings. (st)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 1:17-cr-00343-EJL.) filed by Arcenio Sosa-Solorio.(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa-Solorio v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Christopher Steven Atwood
Represented By: Kevin T Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arcenio Sosa-Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?