Western Watersheds Project v. Department of the Interior
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2019cv00369
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The parties Joint Motion to Vacate All Deadlines and Stay Case, (Dkt. #9 ), is GRANTED. The stay will be in effect up through December 31, 2020.. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Department of the Interior and counsel for Western Watersheds Project re #8 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/21/2020. (jd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Vacate all Deadlines and Stay Case Robert Burke Firpo appearing for Defendant Department of the Interior. Responses due by 12/9/2019 (Firpo, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Burke Firpo on behalf of Department of the Interior (Firpo, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Watersheds Project (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Return Reciept)(Lake, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Lake, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 8, 2020, at 10:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before January 2, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David A. Bahr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1943939.)Scott Lake appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Lake, Scott)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1943917.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lake, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Scott Lake
Represented By: David A Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Robert Burke Firpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?