NAVEX Global, Inc. v. Stockwell
Plaintiff: Richard A. Stockwell, Jr. and NAVEX Global, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00382
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr., #11 Order and #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NAVEX Global, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Stockwell's Motion to Dismiss and, Alternatively, to Strike (Dkt. #12 ) is DENIED. NAVEX's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #16 ) is GRANTED in PART, DENIED in PART. The Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 11) shall be null, void, and of no effect once this Order issues. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C. Nye: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2019 re #12 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr., #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by NAVEX Global, Inc. Matters are deemed UNDER ADVISEMENT and the Court will issue a Written Decision. (Court Reporter/ESR Katherine Eismann.) (paf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #1 Exhibit 20 and Exhibit Lists (Sealed)) (ckh).
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NAVEX Global, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Robertson in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark Robertson, #3 Declaration of Mike Porter in Support, #4 Declaration of Shane Harrison in Support, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Shane Harrison)(Miller, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 Exhibit List AMENDED by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Miller, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction by NAVEX Global, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Miller, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 Exhibit List and Plaintiff's Potential Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by NAVEX Global, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Witness List)(Miller, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 Exhibit List and Witness List by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Miller, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr.. Replies due by 11/29/2019.(Miller, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr.. Replies due by 11/27/2019.(Miller, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition to Stockwell's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by NAVEX Global, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2019.(Miller, William)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's Expedited Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Dkt. #17 ) is GRANTED. Defendant may file up to twenty-eight (28) pages in his Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #16 ). The Court will also extend the same courtesy to Plaintiff for its Reply - Plaintiff's Reply may contain up to eight (8) extra pages. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (tb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 Expedited MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Joseph C Miller appearing for Defendant Richard A. Stockwell, Jr.. Responses due by 12/3/2019 (Miller, Joseph)
November 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 11/13/2019. Replies due by 11/15/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2019 09:00 AM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge David C. Nye. (ckh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction William Kappes Miller appearing for Plaintiff NAVEX Global, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support)(Miller, William)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction will take place on November 19, 2019 at 9:00 AM in the U.S. Courthouse in Pocatello, Idaho. Plaintiff must file its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before November 7, 2019. Defendant may then file his Response on or before November 13, 2019. Defendant may treat this Response as a response to both the TRO and the preliminary injunction motions. Plaintiff may then file its Reply, if any, on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Surety BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by NAVEX Global, Inc. (ckh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Richard A. Stockwell, Jr..(Miller, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Joseph C Miller appearing for Defendant Richard A. Stockwell, Jr.. Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Miller, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: NAVEX's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED, and until this Court orders otherwise, for the next twenty-eight (28) days, or until such time as the parties agree in writing to amend, supersede, or terminate this TRO: (a) Stockwell shall refrain from, and immediately cease, his employment and/or any other business relationship with Whispli, or any other direct competitor of NAVEX; and (b) Stockwell shall immediately return his NAVEX laptop, and refrain from using or disclosing any NAVEX trade secrets in his possession. NAVEX shall post a $10,000 security bond, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), which shall remain posted until such time that the TRO is dissolved. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: A hearing on the #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 11/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge David C. Nye. (ab)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Pursuant to communications with counsel, a hearing on NAVEX's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #6 ) will take place on November 1, 2019 at 9:00 AM. Stockwell's response is due on or before October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (tb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Shon Ramey re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by NAVEX Global, Inc. in Support of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by NAVEX Global, Inc..(Miller, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order William Kappes Miller appearing for Plaintiff NAVEX Global, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Miller, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAVEX Global, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Miller, William)
October 3, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew E Moriarty for NAVEX Global, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Richard A. Stockwell, Jr. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew E. Moriarty. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1948171.)William Kappes Miller appearing for Plaintiff NAVEX Global, Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2019 (Miller, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAVEX Global, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NAVEX Global Holding Company for NAVEX Global, Inc... (Miller, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard A. Stockwell, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1948149.), filed by NAVEX Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Miller, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAVEX Global, Inc. v. Stockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Stockwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAVEX Global, Inc.
Represented By: William Kappes Miller
Represented By: Andrew E Moriarty
Represented By: Christine Salmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?