Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council, Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Idaho Sporting Congress
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, Tawnya Brummett, United States Forest Service, Regional Forester Nora Rasure and Nora Rasure
Case Number: 1:2019cv00445
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30:1201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: All Defendants. Answer due date 1/27/20 (jp)
January 9, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #9 Summons Returned Executed was filed using the incorrect docket event. The event that should have been used is "Summons Returned Executed as to USA." The correct answer due date is 1/27/20. No further action required.(jp)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystems Council, Idaho Sporting Congress. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Christiansen, #2 Brummett, #3 Rasure)(Bricklin, David)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 02:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before February 14, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Tawnya Brummett, Vicki Christiansen, Idaho Sporting Congress, Native Ecosystems Council, Nora Rasure, United States Forest Service re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/27/2020. (alw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C Duffy on behalf of All Defendants (Duffy, Sean)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Claudia M Newman for Alliance for the Wild Rockies,Claudia M Newman for Idaho Sporting Congress,Claudia M Newman for Native Ecosystems Council Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Claudia M. Newman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1972291.)David A Bricklin appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Idaho Sporting Congress, Native Ecosystems Council. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (Bricklin, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(alw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Idaho Sporting Congress, Native Ecosystems Council. (Attachments: #1 Corp. Disclosure ISC, #2 Corp. Disclosure NEC)(Bricklin, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1970885.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Forest Service, #3 Summons Vicki Christiansen, #4 Summons Brummett, #5 Summons Rasure)(Bricklin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Represented By: Sean C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawnya Brummett
Represented By: Sean C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Sean C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Forester Nora Rasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Rasure
Represented By: Sean C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Represented By: Claudia M Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Represented By: Claudia M Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Sporting Congress
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Represented By: Claudia M Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?