Hugunin v. United States of America Social Security Survivor Trust Fund
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Defendant: United States of America Social Security Survivor Trust Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv00462
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harvey William Hugunin. Address has been updated. (jd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Harvey W. Hugunin. (ckh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Harvey W. Hugunin. (ckh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Harvey Hugunin re: #3 Order of Conditional Filing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ckh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i-iii), without leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (docket no. #1 ) is DEEMED MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk close this case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/16/2019, to correct the spelling of Defendant) (jd).
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. (jd) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i-iii), without leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (docket no. #1 ) is DEEMED MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk close this case Modified on 1/8/2020 to add order in docket text (km).
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Harvey W. Hugunin. (ckh)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America Social Security Survivor Trust Fund, filed by Harvey William Hugunin.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #4 Statement of Claimant or Other Person, #5 Certificate of Birth, #6 Military Discharge DD 214) (kt).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harvey William Hugunin. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugunin v. United States of America Social Security Survivor Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Social Security Survivor Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?