Vidmar v. Idaho Power Company
Plaintiff: Peter Vidmar
Defendant: Idaho Power Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00475
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Peter Vidmar. Replies due by 2/12/2020.(Gunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Status Conference held on 1/16/2020. Case Management Order entered; those dates govern. (Court Reporter/ESR lc.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)THESE MINUTES SHALL STAND AS THE ORDER OF THE COURT
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following deadlines and procedures will govern this litigation: All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by 8/14/20. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before 4/9/20. The parties have chosen to participate in a judicially supervised settlement conference. ADR must be held by 10/16/20. All fact discovery must be completed by 7/31/20. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on 4/14/20 at 2:30 p.m. Mountain Time for the purpose of inquiring about the status of discovery. Defendant must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-1495 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Kara L. Heikkila appearing for Defendant Idaho Power Company. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Heikkila, Kara)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by Idaho Power Company . (Heikkila, Kara)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Idaho Power Company. (Heikkila, Kara)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Idaho Power Company, filed by Peter Vidmar.(Gunn, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. On or before JANUARY 7, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (alw)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER ADOPTING #7 Stipulation. The Court hereby finds good cause to grant an extension of time to December 27, 2019 for the filing of either an Amended Complaint or a Motion to Dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Continue Date to File Answer by Idaho Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Heikkila, Kara)
December 13, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge William G Young no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-475-REB (alw)
December 13, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William G Young. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00475-WGY on all future pleadings. (st)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William G Young from the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Power Company, Peter Vidmar re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/4/2020. (alw)
December 6, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Idaho Power Company served on 12/4/2019. (alw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Power Company identifying Corporate Parent IDACORP, Inc. for Idaho Power Company.. (Heikkila, Kara)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Idaho Power Company from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-19-20722.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1978436.), filed by Idaho Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Docket Register Ada County)(Heikkila, Kara) Modified on 12/6/2019 to remove duplicate language(alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidmar v. Idaho Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Power Company
Represented By: Kara L. Heikkila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Vidmar
Represented By: Phillips S Erica
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?