Giese v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael A Giese
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00016
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint Litigation Plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2020 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 28, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Shubb. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00016-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Swajkoski, Jennifer)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael A Giese, USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/9/2020. (jd)
January 9, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 1/8/2020. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Docket. (Walters, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company did not provide the state court docket sheet. The State Court documents should be attachments to the Notice of Removal. Each one should be a separate attachment. Please provide the state court docket, any answers, pending motions and any service documents. The filing party shall file the requested documents as a supplement and link them to the Notice of Removal Dkt. 1.(jd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Walters, Matthew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-19-12473.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1992453.), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Matthew L. Walters, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Summons, #6 Exhibit D - Statement of Claim)(Walters, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giese v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Giese
Represented By: Clinton E Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Represented By: Jennifer L Swajkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?