Reinbold v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Kenneth Carl Reinbold
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00034
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS - Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application(Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 ERRATA by Petitioner Kenneth Carl Reinbold re #1 Petition for Review . (Parkinson, Brad)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and civil process clerk. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Commissioner of Social Security)(jd)
January 23, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry Dkt. 1-4 was filed incorrectly in this case. It is page 2 of a summons and the first page of the In Forma Pauperis Application. It is unclear what this attachment is supposed to be. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing as Errata and link it to Dkt. 1.(jd)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Kenneth Carl Reinbold This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Kenneth Carl Reinbold. Responses due by 2/12/2020 (Parkinson, Brad)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Kenneth Carl Reinbold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinbold v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Carl Reinbold
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?