Banner Life Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Talese L. Anderson and Jordan M. Eggers
Case Number: 1:2020cv00036
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Auxier on behalf of Jordan M. Eggers (Auxier, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Talese L. Anderson, Banner Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/11/2020. (alw)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Jordan M. Eggers served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Jordan M. Eggers by Talese L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Logan, Shawn)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Talese L. Anderson served on 2/16/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Legal & General Group PLC for Banner Life Insurance Company.. (Diddle, Samuel)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Talese L. Anderson, Jordan M. Eggers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Diddle, Samuel)
January 27, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Banner Life Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-file the Cover Sheet with a date and signature.(alw)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banner Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2000460.), filed by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jordan Eggers, #3 Summons Talese Anderson)(Diddle, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banner Life Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talese L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan M. Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel A Didle
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?