Lloyd v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Lloyd
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc and Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
2 Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 25, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 10 Notice (Other) was filed incorrectly in this case and has been removed from the docket. Please note for future, consent forms are to be mailed to the Clerk's office or emailed to consents@id.uscourts.gov. No further action is needed.(jd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 DISREGARD. See corrective entry (jd).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING PRIOR HEARINGS AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - IT IS ORDERED THAT all deadlines and hearings set prior to this reassignment are HEREBY VACATED. A telephonic pretrial conference is set for April 6, 2020 at 9:00a.m. (Mountain) in Judge Freudenthal's Chambers. At least 7 days prior to the pretrial conference, in compliance with the Courts General Administrative Order 2013-02 the parties shall file a joint case management plan. Signed by Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Freudenthal. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00049-NDF on all future pleadings. (st)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy D Freudenthal from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.. (Diddle, Samuel)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before March 30, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Registry, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal - State Court)(Diddle, Samuel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., and to counsel for John Lloyd re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/3/2020. (jd)
February 3, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
February 3, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal. The filing party shall re-submit their attachments as separate documents and labeled the document name. When resubmitting use the ECF event "Supplement" and link it to the Notice of Removal docket number #1 . Do NOT use the Notice of Removal event. (jd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc.(Diddle, Samuel)
January 31, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket entry 2 was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party attached the wrong document to the docket entry. Please re-submit the correct filing. (ckh)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 DISREGARD ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc.(Diddle, Samuel) Modified on 2/3/2020, wrong document attached. See corrective entry (jd).
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc from Twin Falls County Fifth Judicial District, case number cv42-20-0030.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2003703.), filed by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Cover Sheet)(Diddle, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lloyd
Represented By: Brian James Hilverda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?