Eimers et al v. Chipor Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bart Eimers, Tara Eimers-Bean, Kirk Eimers and Mason Eimers-Burkland
Defendant: Chipor Holdings, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00092
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2020 04:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. Parties and/or members of the public may use the following to attend this matter: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. (same date/time as previously set, new call-in instructions only) (at)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney J Thomas Beckett for Bart Eimers, Kirk Eimers, Tara Eimers-Bean, and Mason Eimers-Burkland. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by J. Thomas Beckett. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2022840.)Richard H Greener appearing for Plaintiffs Bart Eimers, Kirk Eimers, Tara Eimers-Bean, Mason Eimers-Burkland. Responses due by 3/30/2020 (Greener, Richard)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kirk Eimers, Bart Eimers, Mason Eimers-Burkland, Tara Eimers-Bean. Chipor Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Greener, Richard)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on May 4, 2020, at 4:30 PM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before April 27, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chipor Holdings, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Chipor Holdings, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company d/b/a Orange Torpedo Trips ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2015635.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greener, Richard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/24/2020 with correct PDF document) (km). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #2 Summons) (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eimers et al v. Chipor Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Eimers
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: J Thomas Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Eimers-Bean
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: J Thomas Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Eimers
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: J Thomas Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Eimers-Burkland
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: J Thomas Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipor Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?