Robinson et al v. Idaho Legislature
Plaintiff: Melissa Sue Robinson and The National Association for the Advancement of Transgendered People (NAATP)
Defendant: Idaho Legislature
Case Number: 1:2020cv00098
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jp)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Melissa Sue Robinson & counsel for Idaho Legislature, re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/18/2020. (jp)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by W Scott Zanzig on behalf of Idaho Legislature (Zanzig, W)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dayton Patrick Reed appearing for Defendant Idaho Legislature. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Reed, Dayton)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayton Patrick Reed on behalf of Idaho Legislature (Reed, Dayton)
February 26, 2020 Summons Issued as to Idaho Legislature. (jp)
February 26, 2020 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 25775 (jp)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against Idaho Legislature, filed by Melissa Sue Robinson, The National Association for the Advancement of Transgendered People (NAATP).(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2020: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Idaho Legislature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Legislature
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: W Scott Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sue Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Association for the Advancement of Transgendered People (NAATP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?