Babineau v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Miriam S. Babineau
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00130
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re #15 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. The Court hereby APPROVES the case management schedule. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Englert, Jack)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Counsel shall confer and submit a Proposed Case Schedule (joint litigation and discovery plan), including dates for two rounds of simultaneousbriefing, by 5/20/2020 as previously ordered; and the telephonic scheduling conference set for 5/27/2020 is VACATED (Doc. 8). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jack Zouhary: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/14/2020. Order forthcoming. Hearing Not Recorded. (st)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam S. Babineau. All Defendants. (Anegon, Anthony)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Docket Text Notice of Hearing: Initial Phone Status is set for April 14, 2020 at 9:00 AM (MDT). At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status(st)
April 1, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Zouhary. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00130-JZ on all future pleadings. (st)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Jack Zouhary from the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts my Judicial Assistant, Amy Beers, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on May 27, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9022 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before May 20, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Miriam S. Babineau and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company re #1 Complaint and #3 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/1/2020. (ckh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jack M Englert, Jr for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jack Englert. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2031172.)Christopher C McCurdy appearing for Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (McCurdy, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life Inc, Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (McCurdy, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(McCurdy, Christopher)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2023525.), filed by Miriam S. Babineau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Anegon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babineau v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack M Englert, Jr
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam S. Babineau
Represented By: Anthony C Anegon
Represented By: Anthony C. Anegon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?