Martinez v. Cactus Grill, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Billy Elser and Kiley Martinez
Defendant: Cactus Grill, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00131
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Cactus Grill, LLC, Billy Elser and Kiley Martinez re #1 Complaint and #5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/22/2020. (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cactus Grill, LLC. (Redmond, Brooke)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cactus Grill, LLC, Billy Elser.(Redmond, Brooke)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before May 28, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cactus Grill, LLC and Billy Elser. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Elser Summons) (ckh)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry, #1 Complaint filed by Kiley Martinez. (Wessel, Jacob)
March 11, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kiley Martinez was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing attorney must sign (electronic signature acceptable) and date the Civil Cover Sheet. The filing party shall please re-submit their correct filing as an Amended Civil Cover Sheet using the Civil Cover Sheet event. (ckh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2023874.), filed by Kiley Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Summons 003 SUMMONS, #2 Summons 004 SUMMONS, #3 Cover Sheet 002 COVER SHEET)(Wessel, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Cactus Grill, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Elser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiley Martinez
Represented By: Jacob S. Wessel
Represented By: Jacob Scott Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Grill, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Eric Bastian
Represented By: Brooke Baldwin Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?