Anderson v. State of Idaho et al
Petitioner: Lance Charles Anderson
Respondent: US Federal Court of Spokane WA, State of Idaho and Nez Perce Tribal Court
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Filing date updated on 3/26/2020(kt).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF IDAHO. Case transferred to District of Idaho. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Construed Amended PETITION re: #1 Construed Petition Filed by Lance Charles Anderson (additional exhibits included). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLP, Case Administrator)
March 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #SPO036634 in the amount of $5.00 from Lance Anderson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiencies. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (CLP, Case Administrator)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 CONSTRUED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Filed by Lance Charles Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Federal Court of Spokane WA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nez Perce Tribal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lance Charles Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?