Taylor v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Larry Alan Taylor
Defendant: Kimberly Nagal, Nate Nagal and Eileen Taylor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00168
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO INITIAL REVIEW ORDER filed by Larry Alan Taylor. (jp)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE- It is ORDERED that, within 30 days after entry of this Order, if Plaintiff desires to attempt to proceed in this case, he shall submit an amended complaint to correct the deficiencies set forth above. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit a notice of voluntary dismissal. If Plaintiff does nothing further within this time frame, judgment will be entered,dismissing the Complaint for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS and Withdrawal of Inmate Filing Fee From Prison Trust Account of Larry Alan Taylor. Granting #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Alan Taylor. (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (cc: Finance and Josh Tewalt)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COMPLAINT (Prisoner) against All Defendants, filed by Larry Alan Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachments)(kt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Alan Taylor. (kt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Larry Alan Taylor. Responses due by 4/22/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Nagal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Nagal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Alan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?