Barbey v. Ada County, Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Barbey
Defendant: Ada County Board of Commissioners, Ada County, Idaho, Horizon Tower, LLC. and Horizon Tower Limited Partnership II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00222
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Stephen Barbey re #1 Complaint Exhibits A and B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schild, Raymond)
June 17, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stephen R. Bough. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00222-SRB on all future pleadings. (st)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough from the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Barbey. Horizon Tower Limited Partnership II waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Schild, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Barbey. Horizon Tower, LLC. waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Schild, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Barbey. Ada County, Idaho waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Schild, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Barbey. Ada County Board of Commissioners waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Schild, Raymond)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Stephen Barbey Association of Counsel (Leroy, David)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Ada County Board of Commissioners, #2 Summons Horizon Tower Limited Partnership II, #3 Summons Horizon Tower LLC) (ckh)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew J. Campanelli for Stephen Barbey. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Campanelli. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2047412.)Raymond Douglas Schild appearing for Plaintiff Stephen Barbey. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (Schild, Raymond)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ada County, Idaho, Ada County Board of Commissioners, Horizon Tower Limited Partnership II and Horizon Tower, LLC filed by Stephen Barbey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ckh)
May 12, 2020 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $400.00, receipt #0976-2046921 Paid in Full. (jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbey v. Ada County, Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County, Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Tower, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Tower Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Barbey
Represented By: Raymond Douglas Schild
Represented By: Andrew J. Campanelli
Represented By: David H Leroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?