Bernat v. Psychemedics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bernat
Defendant: Psychemedics Corporation and General Electic Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00225
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Psychemedics Corporation to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Psychemedics Corporation. (Burke, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tamsen L Leachman appearing for Defendant General Electic Corporation. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Leachman, Tamsen)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tamsen L Leachman appearing for Defendant General Electic Corporation. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Leachman, Tamsen)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #13 Stipulation filed by Psychemedics Corporation. Psychemedics Corporation answer due 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Bill R Wilson. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Psychemedics Corporation to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Psychemedics Corporation. (Burke, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER/TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Rule 26f Conference to be held on or before 8/31/20. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Bill R Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 06/23/20.(mb)
June 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Wilson. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00225-BRW on all future pleadings. (st)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Bill R Wilson from the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Nicholas Bernat and Psychemedics Corporation re #1 Complaint and #5 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/10/2020. (ckh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney D Faye Caldwell for Psychemedics Corporation. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Psychemedics Corporation. (Burke, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by D. Faye Caldwell. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2059706.)John J Burke appearing for Defendant Psychemedics Corporation. Responses due by 7/1/2020 (Burke, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Psychemedics Corporation to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Psychemedics Corporation. (Burke, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Burke on behalf of Psychemedics Corporation (Burke, John)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Psychemedics Corporation on 5/20/2020, filed by Nicholas Bernat. (O'Hare, Joshua)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on General Electric Co on 5/18/2020, filed by Nicholas Bernat. (O'Hare, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Electic Corporation, Psychemedics Corporation. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Electic Corporation, Psychemedics Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2047034.), filed by Nicholas Bernat. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(O'Hare, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernat v. Psychemedics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bernat
Represented By: Joshua M. O'Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychemedics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?