Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company v. Bradley, et al.
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Aaron J Bradley and Megan C Burks
Case Number: 1:2020cv00254
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. Aaron J Bradley waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Thomson, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. Megan C Burks waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Thomson, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Summons and Complaint by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Thomson, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/30/2020 03:00 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. The related deadline of 7/23/2020 to file the joint Litigation and Discovery Plans is also vacated. (at)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 23, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2020 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent FBL Financial Group, Inc for Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Thomson, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Burks)(jd)
June 2, 2020 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Southern Division and case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00254-BLW for all future filings. (jd)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2054158.), filed by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thomson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company v. Bradley, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron J Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan C Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James S Thomson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?