Reclaim Idaho et al v. Little et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00268
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 27 On Application for Stay by Supreme Court of the United States as to #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bradley Little, Lawerence Denney (jp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by Reclaim Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to Status Report, #3 Affidavit Mayville 5th Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Mayville 5th Declaration)(Ferguson, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT on Compliance with Court's June 30th Order by Reclaim Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Status Report, #2 Affidavit 4th Mayville Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to 4th Mayville Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to 4th Mayville Declaration)(Ferguson, Deborah)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of USCA as to #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bradley Little, Lawerence Denney. The court sua sponte expedites this appeal. The opening brief is due July 17, 2020. The answering brief is due July 29, 2020. The optional reply brief is due August 3, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Dissent)(jp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little re #19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, (Larrondo, Megan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of USCA (20-35584) as to #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bradley Little, Lawerence Denney (Attachments: #1 Mediation Questionnaire)(kt) (Main Document 22 replaced on 7/7/2020) (jp). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/7/2020) (jp).
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 USCA Case Number 20-35584 for #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bradley Little, Lawerence Denney. (kt)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Memorandum Decision,,, Order,,, Terminate Motions,, #19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0976-2069893. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Berry, Robert)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER - Plaintiffs Expedited Motion to Enforce the Courts Order (Dkt. #18 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as explained in this decision. The 48-day period provided for Reclaim Idaho to resume its petition gathering activities begins July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 Expedited MOTION to Enforce Court's Order , Craig Durham appearing for Plaintiffs Luke Mayville, Reclaim Idaho. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Durham, Craig)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY - Defendants Notice And Motion To Stay Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 62(D) and F.R.A.P. 8 (Dkt. #16 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay re #14 Memorandum Decision,,, Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Robert Arthur Berry appearing for Defendants Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little. Responses due by 7/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berry, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/23/20 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tamara I. Hohenleitner, Email tammy_hohenleitner@id.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed until release of transcript restriction re #13 Motion Hearing,. Redaction Request due 7/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2020. (th)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED. 2. On or before June 26, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. M.S.T., Defendants must file with the Court a notice detailing the reasonable accommodation they have chosen to make to preserve Plaintiffs' core political speech rights as detailed in this Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: A Video Motion Hearing was held on 6/23/2020 re #2 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion GRANTED. An order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 ERRATA by Defendants Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little re #11 Supplement, . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Phil McGrane)(Berry, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little re #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Supplemental Declaration of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Jason Hancock, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Phil McGrane)(Berry, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Luke Mayville re #2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2nd Supplemental Declaration of Luke Mayville filed by Reclaim Idaho.(Ferguson, Deborah)
June 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luke Mayville, Reclaim Idaho.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Luke Mayville, #3 Declaration of Counsel)(Durham, Craig)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little. Replies due by 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phil McGrane, #2 Declaration of Jason Hancock, #3 Exhibit A to Hancock Declaration, #4 Declaration of Sheryl Millard, #5 Exhibit A to Millard Declaration, #6 Declaration of Andrew Mitzel, #7 Exhibit A to Mitzel Declaration, #8 Declaration of Counsel, #9 Exhibit A to Counsel Declaration)(Berry, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: A Video Motion Hearing is set for 6/23/2020 at 2:00 PM (Mountain Time) before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The Parties will be provided a link to connect to video separately. The public may listen to the hearing by phone using the following information: 1-669-254-5252; Meeting ID: 161 049 1843; Password: 595473. Members of the public are reminded to mute their phones and that recording the proceedings is prohibited.(jlb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little, Luke Mayville, Reclaim Idaho re #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/10/2020. (jp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ann Larrondo on behalf of Lawerence Denney, Bradley Little (Larrondo, Megan)
June 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Per Order dkt 4, Responses due by 6/18/2020 Replies due by 6/22/2020. (jp)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 : Defendants must file a response on or before June 18, 2020 and any reply must be filed on or before June 22, 2020. A hearing on the motion will be set via forthcoming notice of hearing. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (ah)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
June 6, 2020 Filing 2 Expedited MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Craig Durham appearing for Plaintiffs Luke Mayville, Reclaim Idaho. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Luke Mayville, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Schroeder, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Deborah Silver, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Ashley Prince, #6 Exhibit Declaration Linda Larson, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Lansing)(Durham, Craig)
June 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2057610.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Governor LIttle, #3 Summons Secretary of State Denney)(Durham, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reclaim Idaho et al v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?