Birdsall v. Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Birdsall
Defendant: Brigham Young University - Idaho
Case Number: 1:2020cv00270
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc.. (Andersen, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before September 10, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
July 22, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Benjamin Birdsall and Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #9 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/21/2020. (ckh)
July 22, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 12 Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline was entered in error. Please disregard. Deadlines termed. (ckh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 DISREGARD PER CORRECTIVE ENTRY -- NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Benjamin Birdsall and Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #9 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/21/2020. (ckh) Modified on 7/22/2020 to indicate disregard (ckh).
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc.. (Andersen, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Krug on behalf of Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc. (Krug, Haley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven B Andersen on behalf of Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc. (Andersen, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Birdsall. All Defendants. (Thompson, Jason)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brittany S Scott and #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney L Timothy Fisher for Benjamin Birdsall. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by L. Timothy Fisher. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2066741.)Jason S Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Benjamin Birdsall. Responses due by 7/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 L. Timothy Fisher Court Admissions Addendum)(Thompson, Jason) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/24/2020 with a version that cannot be edited) (ckh).
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brittany S. Scott. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2066735.)Jason S Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Benjamin Birdsall. Responses due by 7/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brittany S. Scott Court Admissions Addendum)(Thompson, Jason) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/24/2020 with a version that cannot be edited) (ckh).
June 11, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 4:20-cv-00270-BLW. (ckh)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned District Judge recuses himself from presiding over this matter. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this matter to another Judge. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:20-cv-00270-DCN for all future filings. (ckh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2058072.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birdsall v. Brigham Young University - Idaho, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham Young University - Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Birdsall
Represented By: Jason S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?