Ennis v. Dr. Dawson
Plaintiff: Steve R. Ennis
Defendant: Dr. Dawson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00290
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $400.00, receipt #26499 Paid in Full. (jld)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steve R. Ennis. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. If Plaintiff does not pay the $400.00 filing fee within 28 days, this case may be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Dawson on June 11, 2020 by Steve R. Ennis. Waiver of Service due by 7/15/2020. (kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steve R. Ennis.(kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steve R. Ennis. (Attachments: #1 Offender Account Activity)(kt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and or partial payments by Plaintiff Steve R. Ennis. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennis v. Dr. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve R. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?