Idaho Gastroenterology Associates LLP et al v. Track Utilities LLC et al
Plaintiff: Idaho Gastroenterlogy Associates LLP, Boise Medical Center LLP, Boise Endoscopy Center, LLC and Idaho Gastroenterology Associates LLP
Defendant: Qwest Corporation, CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Track Utiliites, LLC, Track Utilities LLC and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv00308
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (km)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Substitution - Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by Attorney (Evett, Joshua)
July 30, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/2/2021 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. (jp)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2020. Discovery due by 4/15/2021. Mediation or Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 12/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2021. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on 3/2/21 at 9:30 a.m. Mountain Time for the purpose of inquiring about the status of discovery. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) Modified on 8/3/2020 to correct the file date to 7/30/20(jp).
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by Alexander McLaughlin for the Plaintiff; Tara Martens Miller and Joshua Evett for the Defendants. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2020. Court noted Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans were filed in this matter. Consent process discussed. Clawback order requested. Parties agree to participate in a Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference or mediation on or before 12/31/2020. Scheduling Order forthcoming. Time in Court 2:05-2:15 PM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN by Boise Endoscopy Center, LLC, Boise Medical Center LLP, Idaho Gastroenterlogy Associates LLP -- Joint Discovery Plan. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Boise Endoscopy Center, LLC, Boise Medical Center LLP, Idaho Gastroenterlogy Associates LLP. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Track Utilities LLC, Cross COUNTERCLAIM against Track Utilities LLC by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation.(Martens Miller, Tara)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Track Utiliites, LLC. (Evett, Joshua)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation.(Martens Miller, Tara)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2020 02:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before July 23, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: CenturyTel Service Group, LLC answer due 7/10/2020; Qwest Corporation answer due 7/10/2020. (jp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Track Utilities LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Demand for Jury Trial and, First CROSSCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against CenturyTel Service Group, LLC by Track Utiliites, LLC.(Evett, Joshua)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ORDER re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to AmendedComplaint. (Dkt. 6.) Pursuant to the Stipulation, CenturyTel Service Group, LLC and Qwest Corporation's response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is due July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation. (Martens Miller, Tara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qwest Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for Qwest Corporation. (Martens Miller, Tara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyTel Service Group, LLC. (Martens Miller, Tara)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Boise Endoscopy Center, LLC, Boise Medical Center LLP, CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Idaho Gastroenterlogy Associates LLP, Qwest Corporation, Track Utiliites, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/21/2020. (jp)
June 19, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation & Track Utilities LLC served on 6/19/2020. ( service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by Defendants CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J- Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit K- Acceptance of Service)(Martens Miller, Tara) Modified on 6/22/2020 to add document descriptions (jp).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation from Fourth Judicial District of Ada County, case number cv01-20-06502.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2065421.), filed by CenturyTel Service Group, LLC, Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- docket sheet, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Summons, #5 Exhibit D-Summons, #6 Exhibit E- Declaration of Service, #7 Exhibit F- Declaration of Service, #8 Exhibit G- Ntc of Appearance, #9 Exhibit H- Ntc of Svc, #10 Exhibit I- Stipulation, #11 Exhibit J- Amd Complaint , #12 Exhibit L-Ntc of Svc, #13 Exhibit M- Ntc of Svc, #14 Exhibit N- Ntc of Removal)(Martens Miller, Tara) Modified on 6/22/2020 to add document descriptions(jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idaho Gastroenterology Associates LLP et al v. Track Utilities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Corporation
Represented By: Erik F Stidham
Represented By: Tara Martens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyTel Service Group, LLC
Represented By: Erik F Stidham
Represented By: Tara Martens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Track Utiliites, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S Evett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Track Utilities LLC
Represented By: Joshua S Evett
Represented By: Cheyenne M House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Gastroenterlogy Associates LLP
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Donald Z. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boise Medical Center LLP
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Donald Z. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boise Endoscopy Center, LLC
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Donald Z. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Gastroenterology Associates LLP
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Donald Z. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?