McCoy v. Saul
Petitioner: Michael James McCoy, Jr.
Respondent: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00339
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer Stinson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Stinson, Summer)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale. Judge Dale is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 30, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-00339-DCN. (jd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case will be reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 PROCESS RECEIPT and Returned Executed Andrew Saul and U.S. Attorney c/o Joanne Rodriguez served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (jd)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 USM form 285 Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Gave 3 copies of form USM form 285, petition, summons and order to USM) (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 Joanne Rodriguez)(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #3 Summons for Andrew Saul, #4 Summons for Attorney General, #5 Summons for Joanne Rodriguez) (jd).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael James McCoy, Jr. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Balance History)(jd)
July 13, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael James McCoy, Jr. is not signed. The filing party shall re-submit their filing completed with signature.(jd)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael James McCoy, Jr re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/28/2020. (ckh)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Michael James McCoy, Jr. This is a sealed document. (ckh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 DISREGARD APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael James McCoy, Jr. Responses due by 7/28/2020. (ckh) Modified on 7/13/2020, not signed see corrective entry (jd).
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - filed by Michael James McCoy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Represented By: Summer Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael James McCoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?