Kruszewski v. Canyon County Prosecuting Attorney Office et al
Petitioner: Vincent A. Kruszewski
Respondent: Bryan Taylor and Canyon County Prosecuting Attorney Office
Case Number: 1:2020cv00372
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Petitioner MOTION to Stay This Case Pending Claims in the State Court by Petitioner Vincent A. Kruszewski. Responses due by 9/30/2020. (ckh)
August 12, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:20-cv-00372-BLW. (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER and ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. IT IS ORDERED: Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner may file a motion to stay this case while he exhausts his claims in state court. Because not all named parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73, this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Vincent A. Kruszewski Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/25/2020. (kt)
July 27, 2020 RECEIPT: Cash Fee Received $ 5, receipt # 26569 (kt)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vincent A. Kruszewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruszewski v. Canyon County Prosecuting Attorney Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent A. Kruszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Canyon County Prosecuting Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?