Parker v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Parker
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2020cv00390
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Parties have advised that a settlement has been reached in this matter, as such, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/7/2020 01:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. Settlement documents forthcoming. (at)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Parker. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Faux, Leland)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on October 7, 2020, at 1:30 PM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. All parties shall use the Court's AT&T teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. On or before September 30, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2085886.), filed by Jennifer Parker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Faux, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Parker
Represented By: Leland Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?