Foster v. Commissioner of Social Securtiy
Petitioner: Harold E. Foster
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Securtiy
Case Number: 1:2020cv00399
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 8, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-00399-BLW. (jd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Securtiy, Harold E. Foster re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/4/2020. (jd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Harold E. Foster. Responses due by 9/3/2020 (Parkinson, Brad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Harold E. Foster This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Harold E. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Commissioner of Social Securtiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold E. Foster
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Securtiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?