Roe Painting, Inc. v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Roe Painting, Inc.
Defendant: Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company, Aegis Security Insurance Company and Outside The Box, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00407
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Claire R Kelly
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Aegis Surety Bonds and Security Insurance LLC on 10/8/2020, filed by Roe Painting, Inc.. (Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Outside the Box VA, LLC on 10/8/2020, filed by Roe Painting, Inc.. (Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 Counterdefendant's ANSWER to #16 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Automatic Fire System Services by Roe Painting, Inc..(Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
October 1, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Claire R. Kelly. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00407-CRK on all future pleadings. (st)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been reassigned to Judge Claire R Kelly from the United States Court of International Trade. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant Automatic Fire System Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Roe Painting, Inc. by Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc..(Campbell, Richard)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company's ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Campbell, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, Outside The Box, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Roe Painting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons -Aegis Security Insurance Company, #2 Summons Summons -Outside The Box, LLC)(Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roe Painting, Inc. upon United States Fire Insurance Company (Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roe Painting, Inc. upon Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc. (Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 DISREGARD - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roe Painting, Inc. upon Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc. (Pickens Manweiler, Terri) Modified on 9/1/2020, filed incorrect paperwork see Dkt. 10 and 11. (jd).
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 DISREGARD - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roe Painting, Inc. upon United States Fire Insurance Company (Pickens Manweiler, Terri) Modified on 9/1/2020, filed incorrect paperwork see Dkt. 10 and 11 (jd).
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roe Painting, Inc.. (Pickens Manweiler, Terri)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Crum & Foster Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US), Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd. for United States Fire Insurance Company. (Campbell, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc.. (Campbell, Richard)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc., Roe Painting, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/26/2020. (alw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Richard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S Fire Ins Co, et al. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2090000.), filed by Roe Painting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - United States Fire Insurance Company, #3 Summons Summons - Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc.)(Pickens Manweiler, Terri) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe Painting, Inc. v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Fire Systems Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outside The Box, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roe Painting, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Pickens Manweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?