United States of America v. Matjasich
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Laura Matjasich
Case Number: 1:2020cv00410
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:20-cv-410-REB. (ckh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment and Dismissal of Claims 2 and 3 without Prejudice Robert Burke Firpo appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Firpo, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America of Joint Motion Consenting to Jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge (Firpo, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Laura Matjasich waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Firpo, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Laura Matjasich. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laura Matjasich, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Firpo, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/21/2020 with a version that cannot be edited) (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Matjasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Matjasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Burke Firpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?