Severson v. Christensen, et al.
Petitioner: Larry Severson
Respondent: IDOC Director Josh Tewalt, Constructive Custodians, Jay Christensen, Lawrence G. Wasden and Josh Tewalt
Case Number: 1:2020cv00429
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Severson. (jd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Larry Severson. Responses due by 9/30/2020. (The filing fee has been paid in this case) (Attachments: #1 Letter)(jd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Larry Severson Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/27/2020. (kt)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Seeking Appointment of Counsel at Public Expense by Petitioner Larry Severson. Responses due by 9/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(kt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Larry Severson.(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Severson v. Christensen, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IDOC Director Josh Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Constructive Custodians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Christensen
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawrence G. Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josh Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?