Colo v. NS Support, LLC
Plaintiff: Brianna Colo
Defendant: NS Support, LLC doing business as Neuroscience Assoc. and NS Support, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Neuroscience Assoc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00437
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brianna Colo. Replies due by 11/23/2020.(Williams, Kimberly)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NS Support, LLC. (Rauer, Portia)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brianna Colo, NS Support, LLC re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/21/2020. (alw)
October 21, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Portia L Rauer appearing for Defendant NS Support, LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rauer, Portia)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brianna Colo. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Williams, Kimberly)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NS Support, LLC, filed by Brianna Colo.(Williams, Kimberly)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Williams, Kimberly)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NS Support, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
September 15, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Brianna Colo was filed incorrectly in this case. Please refile the cover sheet with date and signature.(alw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2101006.), filed by Brianna Colo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Williams, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colo v. NS Support, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS Support, LLC doing business as Neuroscience Assoc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS Support, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Neuroscience Assoc.
Represented By: Portia L Rauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Colo
Represented By: Kimberly Lynette Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?