Jackson v. Twin Falls City Idaho, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jackson
Defendant: Twinn Falls County Sherriffs Dept, Justin Cyr, Twinn Falls City Idaho, Twin Falls County Sheriff's Dept and Twin Falls City Idaho
Case Number: 1:2020cv00449
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(jd)
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in support of 42 USC 1983 filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Confidential Forensic/Psychological Evaluation, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(jd)
November 5, 2020 Filing 21 Affidavit - Motion Letter to Presiding by Michael E. Jackson (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(jd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover letter)(jd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL - Plaintiffs Motion for an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order Against Public Defenders Office in Twin Falls and for Appointment for AttorneyConflict (Dkt. #15 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel in this action (Dkt. #14 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Complaint remains subject to screening by the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court will issue a screening order at a later date. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Michael Jackson. Motions terminated: #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael E. Jackson, #9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael E. Jackson (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Order mailed to Mr. Jackson and to Twin Falls County Sheriff Tom Carter Attn: Inmate Accounts, 425 Shoshone St. N. Twin Falls, ID 83301.
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in support of 42 USC 1983 filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit)(jd)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Jury Demand by trial by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter)(jd)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 11/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover letter)(jd)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 11/10/2020. (jd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in support of Civil Rights Action filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(jd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Michael Jackson requesting a copy of this case. (I mailed him a copy of the docket sheet) (jd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Michael E. Jackson, in support of 42 USC 1983. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover letter)(jd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Second Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael E. Jackson. (jd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Second APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 10/21/2020. (jd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in support of civil rights action filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(jd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION letter to Presiding Judge by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover letter)(jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment Rule 53 Special Master by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 10/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Affidavit)(jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael E. Jackson. (jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (jd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Action Deprivation of Rights against All Defendants, filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Envelope, #4 Cover Letter)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Twin Falls City Idaho, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinn Falls County Sherriffs Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Cyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinn Falls City Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls County Sheriff's Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls City Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?