Davis v. Davis
Plaintiff: Jacob Davis
Defendant: Tyrell Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00475
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. All parties shall use the Court's AT&T teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. On or before January 5, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 9, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #11 Litigation Order, as it was filed in error.(st)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
November 6, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:20-cv-00475-CWD. (ckh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. IT IS ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 4, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:20-cv-00475-DCN. (ckh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay or Abey by Petitioner Jacob Davis. Responses due by 11/16/2020. (ckh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jacob Davis Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/7/2020. (kt)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Petitioner Jacob Davis. Responses due by 10/28/2020 (kt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jacob Davis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support 1 of 7, #2 Memorandum in Support 2 of 7, #3 Memorandum in Support 3 of 7, #4 Memorandum in Support 4 of 7, #5 Memorandum in Support 5 of 7, #6 Memorandum in Support 6 of 7, #7 Memorandum in Support 7 of 7, #8 Affidavit In Support of Memorandum)(kt) Lodging received on 10/9/2020 (kt).
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob Davis. (kt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob Davis. Responses due by 10/28/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrell Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?