Johnson v. Christensen
Petitioner: Robert Johnson
Respondent: Christensen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00489
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
November 12, 2020 RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 5, receipt # 27166 (kt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Letter regarding payment of filing fees from Robert Johnson.(kt)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Robert Johnson re: #3 Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline filed by Robert Johnson, #2 Order of Conditional Filing. (Resent with housing unit number included on mailing label.) (kt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Robert Johnson Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/21/2020. (kt)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Letter regarding filing fee, #2 Affidavit In Support, #3 List, #4 Envelope)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christensen
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?